Impastato v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Impastato
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, Zachary Alan Armstrong, Progressive Mutual Insurance Company, L&L Fencing, LLC, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv14083
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Daniel E Knowles
2 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance Response to 28 USC 1447(b) Directive by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(O'Bryon, Kevin)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company (O'Bryon, Kevin)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(ADI)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (mm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (gk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 781-515 J (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7317840) filed by Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings) Attorney Kevin Cramer O'Bryon added to party Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(O'Bryon, Kevin) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impastato v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Cramer O'Bryon
Represented By: Janell M. McFarland-Forges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Donald John Latuso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald John Latuso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Alan Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&L Fencing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Donald John Latuso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J. Impastato
Represented By: Vincent P. Impastato, Sr.
Represented By: Lloyd N. Frischhertz
Represented By: Anthony J. Impastato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?