Church v. Harrison County
Plaintiff: Church, Church Evans and Sylvester L Evans
Defendant: Harrison County
Case Number: 2:2018cv14205
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Seal Case (R. Doc. #3 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 2/8/2019. (sa)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Harrison County. (caa)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (caa)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7 re #1 Complaint filed by Church.(jeg)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Case by Church. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jeg)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Church. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (jeg)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harrison County filed by Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Harrison County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?