Still v. JPMorgan Chase Holdings, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Curtis A Still
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv14298
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 1/27/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure.**Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as a corporate parent for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., AIG Property Casualty Inc., AIUH LLC, American International Group, Inc., as corporate parents for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Fadaol, Devin) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (am).
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Fadaol, Devin) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (am).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/11/19.(jjs)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - The undersigned U.S. District Judge recuses herself from handling this matter pursuant to 28:455(a). IT IS ORDERED that this matter be re-allotted to another section of this Court. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/4/2019. (NEF: Section R)(sa)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. By the Clerk. (mm)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-02607 I-14 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7328064) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Devin Fadaol added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Devin Fadaol added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(pty:dft).(Fadaol, Devin) Modified text on 12/31/2018 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Still v. JPMorgan Chase Holdings, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis A Still
Represented By: Charles Philip Ciaccio
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Devin Fadaol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Represented By: Devin Fadaol
Represented By: Mary W. Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mary W. Dale
Represented By: Devin Fadaol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?