Empire Indemnity Insurance Company v. Reliance Worldwide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Bernhard MCC, LLC and Reliance Worldwide Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00051
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties are GRANTED leave of court to conduct jurisdictional discovery until Friday, 3/8/19. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corporation file a Third Amended Notice of Removal to allege sufficiently the citizenship of Bernhard MCC, LLC, by identifying and alleging the citizenship of each of the individual members of BLLC Holdco, LLC, by no later than Friday, 3/8/19, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/25/19.(sbs)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Answer to Complaint. **Answer should have been linked to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action by linking the documents.** (sbs)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Reliance Worldwide Corporation.(Everage, Tod) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (sbs).
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-11908 I(14) (Fee previously paid) filed by Reliance Worldwide Corporation.(Everage, Tod) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (sbs).
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Notice of Compliance. **Document should have been linked to the Notice of Removal rather than the Directive of the Clerk. Clerk modified link. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 Compliance Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Reliance Worldwide Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal. (Everage, Tod) Modified text and link on 1/22/2019 (sbs).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Amended Notice of Removal filed by Reliance Worldwide Corporation - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corporation file a Second Amended Notice of Removal to allege sufficiently the citizenship of Bernhard MCC, LLC, by identifying and alleging the citizenship of each of the individual members of BLLC Holdco, LLC, by no later than Tuesday, January 22, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Reliance Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crohan, Richard) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (sbs).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corporation amend its Notice of Removal to allege sufficiently the citizenship of Bernhard MCC, LLC, by no later than Monday, 1/14/2019, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/7/2019.(jls)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Crohan, Richard)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action by flattening the Civil Cover Sheet and replacing the image. Civil Cover Sheet was blank. Clerk contacted filing attorney via email and requested that a completed Civil Cover Sheet be filed and provided the correct event to use when filing.** (sbs)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Reliance Worldwide Corporation. By the Clerk.(sbs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-11908 I(14) (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7338291) filed by Reliance Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )Attorney Richard B Crohan added to party Reliance Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft).(Crohan, Richard) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/7/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company v. Reliance Worldwide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernhard MCC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Richard B Crohan
Represented By: Tod J. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jake P. Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?