Michael v. Blackhawk Transport, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dalvin Michael
Defendant: Gregory Brown, Blackhawk Transport, Inc. and Blackhawk Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00193
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Lance M Africk
1 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND REASONS granting #10 Motion to Remand to State Court. ORDERED that Dalvin Michael'ss motion to remand is GRANTED and that the above-captioned matter is REMANDED to the 29th Judicial District Court for the Parish of St. Charles, State of Louisiana, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (sbs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Dalvin Michael re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sbs)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/11/19. (sbs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Dalvin Michael. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Proposed Exhibit)(Lieberman, Glenn) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (sbs).
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 **DEFICIENT** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Dalvin Michael re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lieberman, Glenn) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (sbs).
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Blackhawk Transport, Inc., Gregory Brown re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dill, James) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (sbs).
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dalvin Michael. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Lieberman, Glenn)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:15 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Parties shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/19.(sbs)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:15 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 6/10/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 8/26/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF:Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2019 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Blackhawk Transport, Inc., Gregory Brown.(Trahan, K.) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (sbs). Modified on 1/16/2019 (blg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Trahan, K.) Modified on 1/16/2019 (blg).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper.' Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gregory Brown, Blackhawk Transportation, Inc.. By the Clerk.(sbs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th JDC, St. Charles Parish, case number 85,487 C (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7354304) filed by Blackhawk Transport, Inc., Gregory Brown.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney K. Wade Trahan added to party Blackhawk Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft), Gregory Brown(pty:dft).(Trahan, K.) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/11/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 1/11/2019 (sbs). Modified on 1/16/2019 (blg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael v. Blackhawk Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Brown
Represented By: K. Wade Trahan
Represented By: James Michael Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Transport, Inc.
Represented By: K. Wade Trahan
Represented By: James Michael Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: K. Wade Trahan
Represented By: James Michael Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalvin Michael
Represented By: Glenn Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?