Chaisson v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert Chaisson
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00263
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt of Transfer Case to California Northern District (my)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Transfer to District of California Northern. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file sent. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(clc)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (jeg)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/15/2019.(blg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7357019) filed by Robert Chaisson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Robert Chaisson(pty:pla).(Centola, Lawrence) (SERVICE WAIVED) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaisson v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chaisson
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Michael E Lillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?