Allied Shipyard, Inc. v. Mister B M/V, In Rem

Plaintiff: Allied Shipyard, Inc. and Allied Shipyard Inc
Defendant: Mister B M/V
Case Number: 2:2019cv00267
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Eldon E Fallon
1 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Allied Shipyard Inc and against Mister B M/V, in the principal sum of $24,356.75. For custodia legis expenses as set forth in order; for pre-judgment and post-judgment interest as listed; and for all costs of these proceedings. IS IS FURTHER ORDERED AS SET FORTH IN ORDER. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/11/19.(dno)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default Judgment as to M/V Mister B, In Rem by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ship repair invoice, #3 Exhibit Wharfage invoice, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (jeg).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Entry of Default as to M/V Mister B, Official Number 1181956. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/19. (dno)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to M/V Mister B, In Rem by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (jeg).
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Publication for Times-Picayune (Callais, Lee) Modified text on 2/15/2019 (jeg).
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT Returned Executed as to M/V MISTER B on 1/24/2019. (jeg)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian as set forth in order. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/18/19. (3cc USM) (dno)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied Shipyard Inc (Callais, Lee)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Allied Shipyard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworn Declaration of Proposed Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest issued. (3cc: USM) (jeg)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/15/2019. (3cc: USM) (jeg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Allied Shipyard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (jeg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mister B M/V, In Rem (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7357967) filed by Allied Shipyard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Lee Anthony Callais added to party Allied Shipyard, Inc.(pty:pla).(Callais, Lee) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (jeg).(3cc:USM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Shipyard, Inc. v. Mister B M/V, In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Shipyard, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Anthony Callais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Shipyard Inc
Represented By: Lee Anthony Callais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mister B M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?