Titus v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Lorelei Ray Titus
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00335
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Social Security Response Order that Plaintiff's brief is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiff's brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on February 21, 2019. (cc: AUSA,EDLA)(mp)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sbs)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration filed by Lorelei Ray Titus re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Deus, Rod) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/22/2019) (sbs).
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7365760) filed by Lorelei Ray Titus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Rod S. Deus added to party Lorelei Ray Titus(pty:pla).(Deus, Rod) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/17/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 1/17/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titus v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorelei Ray Titus
Represented By: Rod S. Deus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?