Cook v. SyncStream Solutions LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Erika Cook
Defendant: Cindy Heine, SyncStream Solutions LLC AKA DBA Enact LLC, SyncStream Solutions, LLC and Enact
Case Number: 2:2019cv00387
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge - This Court having been advised that all parties to this proceeding do not consent to proceed to trial before a Magistrate Judge; IT IS ORDERED that the automatic referral of this matter to the Magistrate Judge under Local Rule 73.2 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/13/2019. (NEF: Mag. 2)(sa)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Scheduling Conference held on 3/12/2019. All parties have not consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Accordingly, the presiding district judge is hereby notified so that he may revoke the automatic referral and schedule a conference to set pretrial and trial dates on her calendar. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be exchanged no later than 3/26/2019. (NEF: Sect M) (caa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cindy Heine, SyncStream Solutions, LLC. Attorney Molly C McDiarmid added to party Cindy Heine(pty:dft).(McDiarmid, Molly) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (mmv).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is hereby SCHEDULED in thismatter on MARCH 12, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B409, New Orleans,Louisiana. The purpose of the conference is to determine if all parties consent to proceed before a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), and to plan future proceedings and set dates and deadlines, if appropriate. Parties who wish to participate in the conference by telephone may do so by contacting the undersigned magistrate judge's chambers at 504-589-7630 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/14/2019.(mmv)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to SyncStream Solutions, LLC answer due 3/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2019. (mmv)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by SyncStream Solutions, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Molly C McDiarmid added to party SyncStream Solutions, LLC(pty:dft).(McDiarmid, Molly)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cindy Heine, SyncStream Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cindy Heine, SyncStream Solutions LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7370197) filed by Erika Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit P-1, #3 Exhibit P-2, #4 Exhibit P-3, #5 Exhibit P-4, #6 Exhibit P-5, #7 Exhibit P-6, #8 Exhibit P-7, #9 Exhibit P-8, #10 Exhibit P-9, #11 Exhibit P-10, #12 Exhibit P-11, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons) Attorney Glenn Charles McGovern added to party Erika Cook(pty:pla).(McGovern, Glenn) Modified text on 1/22/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. SyncStream Solutions LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Heine
Represented By: Molly C McDiarmid
Represented By: Susan W. Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SyncStream Solutions LLC AKA DBA Enact LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SyncStream Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Molly C McDiarmid
Represented By: Susan W. Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enact
Represented By: Molly C McDiarmid
Represented By: Susan W. Furr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Cook
Represented By: Glenn Charles McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?