Sutherland v. Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Roger Sutherland
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C., Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C., Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc., Galliano Marine Services, LLC and Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00414
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Galliano Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David M. Korn added to party Galliano Marine Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Korn added to party Offshore Service Vessels, LLC(pty:dft).(Korn, David)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Galliano Marine Services, LLC on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Sangisetty, Ravi)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Offshore Service Vessels, LLC on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Sangisetty, Ravi)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C., Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7370854) filed by Roger Sutherland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ravi K. Sangisetty added to party Roger Sutherland(pty:pla).(Sangisetty, Ravi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutherland v. Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galliano Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: David M. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Represented By: David M. Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sutherland
Represented By: Ravi K. Sangisetty
Represented By: Whitney Morgan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?