Womack et al v. McDermott, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: E. Lucille P. Womack, Samuel Womack, Jackie L. Womack and Joel Womack
Defendant: McDermott Incorporated, Cameron International Corporation, Copes Vulcan, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Riley Power, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. and Eagle, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00511
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. This matter is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (sbs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by E. Lucille P. Womack, Joel Womack, Samuel Womack re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(sbs)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/20/19. (sbs)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 13). **Document contains incorrect Section and does not contain the Magistrate Judge. All future filings must reflect Section I and Magistrate 1.** (sbs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 13) by E. Lucille P. Womack, Joel Womack, Samuel Womack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Exhibit B)(Donahue, Roshawn) Modified text on 2/21/2019 (sbs).
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by McDermott Incorporated re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Lowenthal, Joseph)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 Supplement to Document by McDermott Incorporated re #9 Notice of Compliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sbs)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Supplement Notice of Compliance. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/12/19. (sbs)
February 12, 2019 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION to Supplement #9 Notice of Compliance. **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document.** (sbs)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Supplement #9 Notice of Compliance by McDermott Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Lowenthal, Joseph) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (sbs).
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Attachment 7 filed upside down. Clerk has corrected image. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by E. Lucille P. Womack, Joel Womack, Samuel Womack. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Notice of Submission)(Donahue, Roshawn) (Attachment 7 replaced on 2/11/2019) (sbs).
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their motion to remand no later than 2/8/2019. FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall file their responses jointly, if they so chooseto the motion to remand no later than 2/15/2019. (blg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Amendment/Supplement to Document, #8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #9 Response/Reply, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ***1. Exhibits for R. Docs. 7 and 8 were imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the images. 2. Filing attorney chose incorrect event for R. Doc. 9. Correct event is 'Notice of Compliance.' Also, the Notice of Compliance should be linked to the Notice of Removal and not the Directive of the Clerk. Clerk took corrective action by modifying the docket text and correctly linking the Notice of Compliance with the Notice of Removal. 3. All filings contain incorrect Section. All future filings must reflect Section I.*** (sbs) Modified text on 2/1/2019 (sbs).
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by McDermott Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Lowenthal, Joseph) Modified text on 1/31/2019 (sbs).
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by McDermott Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lowenthal, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/31/2019) (sbs). Modified event and text on 1/31/2019 (sbs).
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McDermott Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent J. Ray McDermott Holdings, LLC for McDermott Incorporated (Lowenthal, Joseph)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 Amendment/Supplement to Document by McDermott Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit E-1)(Lowenthal, Joseph) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/31/2019) (sbs).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/28/2019. (NEF: Judge Africk)(ajn)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 1/25/2019. (ajn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McDermott Incorporated. (mp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit "D" by McDermott Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Request to Seal)(Lowenthal, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-12036 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7381978) filed by McDermott Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr added to party McDermott Incorporated(pty:dft).(Lowenthal, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #7 SEALED - Exhibit D (part 1), #8 SEALED - Exhibit D (part 2)) (blg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack et al v. McDermott, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Lucille P. Womack
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Womack
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie L. Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Womack
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Represented By: Roshawn H. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDermott Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Jacob Lowenthal, Jr.
Represented By: Madeleine Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph H. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?