Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Raimy Eymard L/B, et al
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Offshore Marine Contractors, Inc., Raimy Eymard L/B, Michael M. Eymard, Raimy D. Eymard and Louis J. Eymard, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv00855
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Christopher Matthew Hannan,Benjamin W. Janke for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Attorney Adam C. McNeil terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/22/2019. (jeg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Withdraw Adam C. McNeil as Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney. **Not necessary to select relief Motion to Withdraw for this document. Only the relief Motion to Substitute is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney Christopher M. Hannan, Benjamin W. Janke, and Kristen L. Hayes by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Kristen Lewis Hayes added to party Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation(pty:pla).(Hayes, Kristen) Modified text/event on 2/21/2019 (mm).
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT of Vessel Seizure issued. (mm) (3cc USM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf's should not have the fillable purple boxes. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Filing attorney did not include all defendants in the case caption. A corrected complaint was subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached as the main document in rec doc. 1.** (mm)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/5/2019. (mm) (3cc USM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/5/2019. (mm) (3cc USM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Louis J. Eymard, II, Michael M. Eymard, Raimy D. Eymard, Offshore Marine Contractors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(mm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Proposed Order)(McNeil, Adam)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Warrant)(McNeil, Adam)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7403931) filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Attorney Adam C. McNeil added to party Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation(pty:pla).(McNeil, Adam) (Attachment 11 replaced on 2/5/2019) (mm). (Attachment 12 replaced on 2/5/2019) (mm). (Attachment 13 replaced on 2/5/2019) (mm). (Attachment 14 replaced on 2/5/2019) (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/5/2019) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Raimy Eymard L/B, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Marine Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raimy Eymard L/B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. Eymard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raimy D. Eymard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis J. Eymard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Adam C. McNeil
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Hannan
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Benjamin W. Janke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?