Briley v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Russell Andre' Briley
Defendant: Unidentified Parties, Stephen Okoye and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00910
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 3/22/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. (ajn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney's Office served on 2/28/2018, answer due 4/29/2018. (ajn)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Writ of Mandamus without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/25/2019. (ajn)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (mailed to Plaintiff w/Pauper Order and Pauper Letter)(ajn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Russell Andre' Briley. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (ajn)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/14/2019. (ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (ajn).
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Andre' Briley. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (ajn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Russell Andre' Briley. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Original Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cures Deficiency)(ajn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 2/28/2019. (ajn)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Stephen Okoye filed by Russell Andre' Briley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Andre' Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Okoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?