Story v. AT&T Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tricia Story and Tricia Melerine Story
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, AT&T Corporation, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner and Christina Ashley Zauner
Case Number: 2:2019cv01185
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting #84 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record, Attorney Karleen J. Green for AT&T Services, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/13/2019. (ajn)
December 12, 2019 Filing 85 ***DUPLICATE OF REC. DOC. 84***EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Kim) Modified on 12/12/2019 (ajn).
December 12, 2019 Filing 84 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record by AT&T Services, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Kim) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (ajn).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized disbursement in the amount of $790,545.57 payable as set out in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/22/2019. (ajn)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that #60 Motion to Dismiss Party is GRANTED, Party Andrew Page Zauner dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #63 Motion for Default Judgment as to Jennifer Scheurich and #64 Motion for Default Judgment as to Christina Zauner are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #65 Motion to Dismiss Party is GRANTED, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #72 Motion for Release of Funds is DENIED as deficient. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/22/2019. (ajn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 81 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Tricia Melerine Story. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(DiVittorio, Frank) Modified text on 8/21/2019 to correct event (ajn).
August 16, 2019 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #65 MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit)(ajn)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/16/2019. (ajn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 78 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Dismiss Party. ***This is considered a "Exparte" filing. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.*** (ajn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 77 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company From Interpleader by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit-Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Notice of Submission)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 8/16/2019 to add 'Exparte/Consent' and remove submission date (ajn).
August 12, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #65 MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company . (DiVittorio, Frank)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Bench Trial set for 3/16/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 74 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Fidelity Workplace Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent FMR, LLC for Fidelity Workplace Services LLC (Lee, Leon)
August 5, 2019 Filing 73 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services,Inc. Modified text on 8/6/2019 to add corporate parents (ajn).
July 31, 2019 Filing 72 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Release of Funds Held in Registry of Court by Tricia Melerine Story. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(DiVittorio, Frank) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (ajn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/1/2019) (ajn).
July 30, 2019 Filing 71 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. (Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (clw).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING #66 Motion for Leave to File Second Page of Declaration Inadvertently Omitted in Document filed on July 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/30/2019. (jeg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #63 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich , #64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christina Ashley Zauner . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew Page Zauner, #2 Affidavit Christina Ashley Zauner, #3 Affidavit Jennifer Lauren Scheurich)(DiVittorio, Frank)
July 29, 2019 Filing 68 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #66 MOTION for Leave to File Second Page of Declaration Inadvertently Omitted in Document filed on July 26, 2019. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect Exparte and removed submission date. (clw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 67 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, #64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christina Ashley Zauner. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 8/21/2019 before Judge Zainey. No further action is necessary. (clw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Second Page of Declaration Inadvertently Omitted in Document filed on July 26, 2019 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Page 2, Suprinski Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (clw).
July 26, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Ex. 1, Declaration of Anne Suprinski, #3 Aff. of Virginia N. Roddy and part 1 of Exhibits, #4 Part 2 of Exhibits, #5 Part 3 of Exhibits, #6 Notice of Submission)(Roddy, Virginia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #7 Page Two of Attachment 1 per order, rec doc 70) (jeg).
July 26, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christina Ashley Zauner by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion set for submission on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Draft Order)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (clw).
July 26, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion will be submitted on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (clw).
July 23, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #60 MOTION to Dismiss Party Andrew Page Zauner . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(DiVittorio, Frank)
July 22, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Party Andrew Page Zauner by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Andrew Page Zauner, #2 Affidavit of Virginia N. Roddy, #3 Notice of Submission)(Roddy, Virginia)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Entry of Default as to Christina Ashley Zauner. Signed by Clerk. (jrc)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Entry of Default as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich. Signed by Clerk. (jrc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Christina Ashley Zauner by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Clerk Entry of Default)(Roddy, Virginia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit with exhibits, #2 Clerk's Entry of Default)(Roddy, Virginia)
June 26, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AT&T Corporation, AT&T Services, Inc..Attorney Kim M. Boyle added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft).(Boyle, Kim)
June 26, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fidelity Workplace Services LLC.(Boyle, Kim)
June 19, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Christina Ashley Zauner served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing;, #2 Letter to Christina, #3 Answer and Counterclaim for Interpleader, #4 USPS verification of delivery of certified mail letter signed by Christina Ashley Zauner)(Roddy, Virginia)
June 19, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jennifer Lauren Scheurich served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Long Arm Letter to Jennifer Scheurich with attachments, #3 Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim for Interpleader, #4 Certified mail receipt)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified on 6/19/2019 (clw).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AND REASONS: Denying #28 Motion to Dismiss as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/11/2019. (ajn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, Andrew Page Zauner, Christina Ashley Zauner. (mp)
May 31, 2019 Filing 49 Request of Summons Issued as to Andrew Page Zauner filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,. (Roddy, Virginia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 48 Request of Summons Issued as to Christina Ashley Zauner filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,. (Roddy, Virginia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 47 Request of Summons Issued as to Jennifer Lauren Scheurich filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,. (Roddy, Virginia)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Into Record Copies of Check Deposited Into Registry of Court And Receipt For Payment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/30/2019. (ajn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Copy of Statement of Claim and check and Receipt for Payment by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Statement of Claim and check, #2 Copy of Receipt for Payment, #3 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia)
May 23, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Tricia Melerine Story. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter of No Objection to Payment of Benefits)(Miranda, John) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (mp).
May 20, 2019 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Counter Defendant Tricia Melerine Story. (ajn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 42 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Roddy, Virginia)
May 16, 2019 Filing 41 SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Case . (ajn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/15/2019. (ajn)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leon H. Lee, Jr. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Pro Hac Vice Counsel) (ajn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Leon H. Lee, Jr.) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7641522) by AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 ECF Registration Form)(Boyle, Kim) (Attachment 1 separated on 5/15/2019) (mp).
May 10, 2019 Filing 37 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. (mp)
May 9, 2019 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #28 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Miranda, John) Modified text/event on 5/10/2019 (mp).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/8/19. (jrc)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants in the Counterclaim for Interpleader, Tricia Melerine Story, Christina Ashley Zauner, Andrew Page Zauner and Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, be served with a copy of the Counterclaim for Interpleader and be required to assert their claims contradictorily against each other for the Death Benefits under the AT&T Group Life Insurance Plan (Death Benefits), under which Michael P. Zauner was covered on the date of his death, plus applicable interest, if any; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2361, the Defendants in the Counterclaim for Interpleader, Tricia Melerine Story, Christina Ashley Zauner, Andrew Page Zauner and Jennifer Lauren Scheurich, be, and they are hereby, restrained and enjoined from instituting or prosecuting any other suit or proceeding in any State or United States court against MetLife, relating to the Death Benefits, plus any applicable interest payable as a consequence of the death of the Insured, Michael P. Zauner; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court be ordered to deposit into the registry of the Court the Death Benefits plus applicable interest, if any, until further Order from the Court; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, following payment of the Death Benefits, plus any applicable interest, into the registry of the Court, MetLife shall be discharged from further liability for the Death Benefits plus any applicable interest; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after due proceedings had, MetLife shall be awarded its reasonable costs and attorneys' fees incurred in commencing and prosecuting this Counterclaim for Interpleader; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after due proceedings had, MetLife shall be dismissed from this action with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/8/19. (NEF: Financial)(jrc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (mm)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/2/2019. (mm)
April 30, 2019 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e) by AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Kim)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for hard copy re #29 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Tricia Melerine Story. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tricia Melerine Story re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Miranda, John)
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Case by AT&T Corporation, AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Kim M. Boyle added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft).(Boyle, Kim)
April 11, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #17 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(ajn)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/10/2019. (ajn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Interpleader Order by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Roddy Affidavit, Ex. 1, #3 Ex. A Copies of Interpleader orders, #4 Ex B, Miranda email, #5 Ex. C Bowen Letter, #6 Ex. D Reso email, #7 Ex. E Letters to Judge, #8 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike Motion for Interpleader Order . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Suprinski, Ex. 1, #2 Affidavit of Virginia N. Roddy, Ex. 2, #3 Ex. A, letters to Judge Zainey, #4 Ex. B, Life Insurance Claim Form, #5 Ex, C, Jan. 8, 2019 letter, #6 Ex. D, Bowen letter, #7 Ex. E, Petition for Removal, #8 Ex. F, 2/4/2019 letter, #9 Ex. G, 2/22/2019 email, #10 Ex. H, 3/22/2019 email, #11 Ex. I, Roddy ltr., #12 Ex. J, 3/26/2019 email, #13 Ex.K 3/27/2019 email, #14 Ex. L, 3/28/2019 email, #15 Ex. M,3/29/2019 email)(Roddy, Virginia)
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 DEFICIENT: INTERPLEADER by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit with Ex. A, part 1, #2 Part 2 of Ex. A, #3 Ex. B, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D, #6 Ex. E)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (mp).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Court having been advised that the Motion for Interpleader is opposed, IT IS ORDERED that #17 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) is set for submission on 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/4/2019.(ajn)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (mp)
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Strike Motion for Interpleader Order by Tricia Melerine Story. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Notice of Submission)(Miranda, John) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (mp).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit "F" into the Record. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/27/2019. (ajn)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to AT&T Services, Inc. and Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. Answer is due 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/26/2019. (ajn)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia) Modified on 3/27/2019 to correct event (ajn).
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit F to Defendant, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaim for Interpleader Filed Into Record On March 26, 2019 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. F to Counterclaim for Intrpleader, #2 Proposed Order)(Roddy, Virginia)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Tricia Melerine Story by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 EX. A, part 1, #2 EX. A, part 2, #3 EX. A, part 3, #4 EX. A, part 4, #5 EX. A, part 5, #6 Ex. B, #7 Ex. C, #8 Ex. D, #9 EX. E, #10 EX. G)(Roddy, Virginia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2019: #11 Exhibit F) (ajn).
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by AT&T Services, Inc., Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyle, Kim)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/7/19. (jrc)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to AT&T Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/6/19. (jrc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fidelity Workplace Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kim M. Boyle added to party Fidelity Workplace Services LLC(pty:dft).(Boyle, Kim)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by AT&T Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kim M. Boyle added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft).(Boyle, Kim)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Answer due until and through 3/27/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/25/2019. (ajn)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. ***Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. ALSO, filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.*** (ajn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Pursuant to LR 7.8 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Virginia N. Roddy added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Roddy, Virginia) Modified text to remove referral to magistrate judge and add Exparte to docket text on 2/25/2019 (ajn).
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (DiVittorio, Frank)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; AT&T Corporation served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (DiVittorio, Frank)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AT&T Corporation, Fidelity Workplace Services LLC and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. ***Page 2 of all Summons was not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of the Summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of Summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.*** (ajn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7414904) filed by Tricia Story. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Frank Joseph DiVittorio added to party Tricia Story(pty:pla).(DiVittorio, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. AT&T Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia N. Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services LLC
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: Alex H. Glaser
Represented By: Leon H. Lee, Jr.
Represented By: Karleen J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kim M. Boyle
Represented By: Alex H. Glaser
Represented By: Leon H. Lee, Jr.
Represented By: Karleen J. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Story
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Melerine Story
Represented By: Frank Joseph DiVittorio
Represented By: Patrick Kelly Reso
Represented By: John D. Miranda
Represented By: James Wesley Bearden
Represented By: Elsbet Carroll Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jennifer Lauren Scheurich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Andrew Page Zauner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christina Ashley Zauner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?