State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Man Wah USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: state farm fire and casualty company
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp., Man Wah (USA) Inc. and Man Wah USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01211
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Schmeeckle, Seth)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Man Wah USA Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Schmeeckle, Seth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Simmons, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (ajn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #2 Notice of Submission (Civil Only)) (ajn).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal (Petition). Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/1/19. (ecm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Man Wah USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Centner, Daniel)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Consent to Removal by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Man Wah USA Inc. Attorney Daniel B. Centner added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel B. Centner added to party Man Wah USA Inc.(pty:dft).(Centner, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service; Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. served. (Pri-Tal, Benjamin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/21/2019) (ajn). Modified text on 2/21/2019 (ajn).
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service; Hartford Casualty Insurance Company served. (Pri-Tal, Benjamin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/21/2019) (ajn). Modified text on 2/21/2019 (ajn).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT filed by Rooms to Go Louisiana (Pri-Tal, Benjamin) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (ajn).
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Pipes, William)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. ***The Statement of Corporate Disclosure should be filed separately and not as an attachment to the Removal. Clerk took corrective action and re-docketed the statement of corporate disclosure.*** (ajn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. (ajn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC, case number 2019-10037 Div "E" (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7417318) filed by Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Verification of Notice, #2 Notice of Removal List of Parties, #3 Notice of Removal Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Notice of Removal State Court Petition for Damages)Attorney Benjamin Michael Pri-Tal added to party Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp.(pty:dft).(Pri-Tal, Benjamin) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Man Wah USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: state farm fire and casualty company
Represented By: Blaine T. Aydell
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Kristopher M. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Pri-Tal
Represented By: Jennifer L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Wah (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Wah USA Inc.
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Kristopher M. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?