Williams et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Shawnya Williams, Celestine Paceley Williams, Keena Turner, Wendy Williams, Keena W. Turner, Wendy J Williams and Shawnya M. Williams
Defendant: Reilly-Benton, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Crosby Valve, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., General Electric, Travelers Insurance Company, Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC, Ingersoll Rand Company, Branton Insulations, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Highlands Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., CBS Corporation, Eagle, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., American Motorists Insurance Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., International Paper Company, Crane Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, FMC Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems USA, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company, Atwood & Morrill, Hopeman Brothers, General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated and OneBeacon Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. and Goulds Pumps LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Cross Defendant: Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Claims Resolution Management Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Interiors LLC and Taylor-Seidenbach
Case Number: 2:2019cv01218
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls and Albert L. Bossier, Jr. ("Avondale Interests"), against Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of Cross-Claimants, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Albert L. Bossier, Jr., against Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC, only, in the above-captioned matter, be and are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, reserving the Avondale Interests' full reservation of rights against allremaining defendants and potential parties. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/12/2019. (gec)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear for Attorney David Wayne O'Quinn for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/12/2019. (gec)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls and Albert L. Bossier, Jr.against Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC by Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Blaine Augusta Moore added to party Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC(pty:crd).(Moore, Blaine)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record David O'Quinn by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Melancon on behalf of Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Melancon, David) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cg).
April 22, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Amended/Supplemental Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Blaine Augusta Moore added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:crd).(Moore, Blaine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s Cross Claim and Third Party Demands by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(McCulloch, Lauren)
April 18, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Albert L. Bossier, Jr.'s Cross Claim and Third Party Demands by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(McCulloch, Lauren)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by McCarty Corporation.Attorney Janice M. Culotta added to party McCarty Corporation(pty:crd).(Culotta, Janice)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 Liberty Mutual/Wayne's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Blaine)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 Liberty Mutual/Wayne's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Third-Party Demand by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Moore, Blaine)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 Liberty Mutual/Wayne's ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Petition by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.Attorney Blaine Augusta Moore added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Moore, Blaine)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Kelley Hibey. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa C. Schopfer. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Culotta, Janice)
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Culotta, Janice)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Hibey (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7470969) by Keena W. Turner, Shawnya M. Williams, Wendy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Statement, #4 Exhibit Registration Form)(Swarr, Frank)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Schopfer (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7470958) by Keena W. Turner, Shawnya M. Williams, Wendy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Statement, #4 Exhibit Registration Form)(Swarr, Frank)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jean-Michel LeCointre.. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/7/2019. (cg)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Notice of 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Compliance. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/7/2019. (cg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (cg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (cg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct #7 Notice of Compliance, by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) Modified event and text on 3/7/2019 (cg).
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jean-Michel LeCointre (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7461515) by Keena W. Turner, Shawnya M. Williams, Wendy Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Statement, #4 Exhibit Registration Form)Attorney Frank J. Swarr added to party Keena W. Turner(pty:pla), Attorney Frank J. Swarr added to party Shawnya M. Williams(pty:pla).(Swarr, Frank)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Moore, Blaine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Pleadings, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 State Court Pleadings, #8 State Court Pleadings, #9 State Court Pleadings, #10 State Court Pleadings)(Melancon, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #11 Exhibit 11 State Court Pleadings) (cg).
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - Notice of Removal Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:dft).(Arthur, Mary)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by OneBeacon America Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Ltd, Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited for OneBeacon America Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/12/2019.(cg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2015-6769 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7417816) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Marine Interiors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branton Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Frances M. Montegut
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motorists Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Cougill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnya Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestine Paceley Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keena Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keena W. Turner
Represented By: Timothy W. Porter
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy J Williams
Represented By: Evan Joseph Weems
Represented By: Jean-Michel LeCointre
Represented By: Timothy W. Porter
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Melissa C. Schopfer
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Michael Kelley Hibey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnya M. Williams
Represented By: Timothy W. Porter
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Huntington Ingalls, Inc.
Represented By: David Wayne O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hopeman Brothers Interiors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?