Roberts v. Kinetic Koncepts, LLC

Plaintiff: Zachary Roberts
Defendant: Kinetic Koncepts, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01278
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kinetic Koncepts, LLC. (sa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Kinetic Koncepts, LLC filed by Zachary Roberts re #1 Complaint,. (Hair, Galen)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Zachary Roberts . (Hair, Galen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kinetic Koncepts, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7421953) filed by Zachary Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)Attorney Galen M. Hair added to party Zachary Roberts(pty:pla).(Hair, Galen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2019: #4 AO Form 121) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Kinetic Koncepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetic Koncepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Roberts
Represented By: Galen M. Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?