Afzal v. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: Fiaz Afzal
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv01354
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 USPS Customs Declaration Receipt for International Filing of Rec. Doc. #7 . (mp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security; Office of the General Counsel - US Dept of Homeland Security; US Attorney General; US Attorney - LAED. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons))(sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ 4cc Pauper Order & Complaint)(mp) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mp).
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on March 14, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fiaz Afzal. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Original deficient IFP Application)(sa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review, Due Process Violation, and Immigration Proceedings, against Department of Homeland Security filed by Fiaz Afzal. (Attachments: #1 Remedy documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibits - Part One, #4 Exhibits - Part Two)(sa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 3/7/2019. (sa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fiaz Afzal. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT for Judicial Review, Due Process Violation, and Immigration Proceedings, against Department of Homeland Security filed by Fiaz Afzal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits - Part One, #3 Exhibits - Part Two)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afzal v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiaz Afzal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?