Cummings et al v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Green, Danila Zaldivar, Rafael Pichardo, Crystal Shook, Stephany Hernandez, Matthew Brumfield, Victor Vega, Deborah Hernandez, Tiffany Cummings, Jair Alvarez, Carolyn Sanders and Gillian Clyne
Defendant: Chase Auto Finace Corp., Capital One, Chase Corporation, Americredit Financial Services, Inc., United States Department of Education through Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc., Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency through American Education Services, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Transunion LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency through FedLoan Servicing, Navient Solutions, LLC, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, Specialized Loan Servicing, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Auto Finance, Navient and USDOE/GLELSI
Case Number: 2:2019cv01377
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Rider, Stephen) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (mmv).
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency's #20 Unopposed Motion to Extend its Deadline to Respond to Complaint, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/4/2019. (mmv)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint . **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document.** (mmv)
April 3, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rider, Stephen) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (mmv).
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Chase Auto Finance, Chase Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilbourn, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/3/2019 (mmv).
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 , #14 , #15 Waivers of Service Executed. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section G, Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.** (mmv)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Rider, Stephen) Modified on 4/2/2019 (mmv).
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Rider, Stephen)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Capital One on 3/22/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Raburn, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Navient on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Raburn, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Americredit Financial Services, Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Raburn, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/15/2019. (mm)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 Motion is GRANTED. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency is granted an additional twenty-one days, until April 3, 2019 to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/15/2019. (mmv)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Christopher D. Meyer by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Christopher Daniel Meyer added to party Americredit Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Meyer, Christopher) Modified text on 3/15/2019 (mm).
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Stephen Winthrop Rider added to party Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency(pty:dft).(Rider, Stephen) Modified linkage on 3/12/2019 (mm).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 4/3/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/11/19. (jrc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jonathan Gray Wilbourn added to party Chase Auto Finance(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Gray Wilbourn added to party Chase Corporation(pty:dft).(Wilbourn, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/8/2019 (mm).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RECUSAL ORDER: Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/15/2019. (NEF: NJB, JCW)(ecm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. **2. Summons requests must be directed to properly named defendants. Clerk adjusted the party names on each Summons to reflect the party names listed in the Complaint and were issued. (sa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Americredit Financial Services, Inc., Capital One, Chase Auto Finance, Chase Corporation, Navient, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency, Specialized Loan Servicing, Transunion LLC, USDOE/GLELSI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(sa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7428066) filed by Tiffany Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (sa). Attorney Jonathan Forrest Raburn added to party Tiffany Cummings(pty:pla).(Raburn, Jonathan) (Attachments 1 through 12 were flattened & replaced on 2/15/2019) (sa). Modified text/pdf images on 2/15/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings et al v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Green
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danila Zaldivar
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Pichardo
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Shook
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephany Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brumfield
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Vega
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Hernandez
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Cummings
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jair Alvarez
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sanders
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gillian Clyne
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Auto Finace Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Gray Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education through Great Lakes Educational Loan Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency through American Education Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency through FedLoan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Stephen Winthrop Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Gray Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Auto Finance
Represented By: Jonathan Gray Wilbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USDOE/GLELSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?