Mitchell v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Lashonda Mitchell
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01445
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General served on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney, EDLA served on 3/8/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ajn) (cc: Pauper Order, Pauper Letter and Complaint) (ajn).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/19/2019. (ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (ajn).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Karl E. Osterhout, as co-counsel for plaintiff, Lashonda Mitchell. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 2/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lashonda Mitchell. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to proceed IFP, #2 Proposed Order)(Lane, Matthew) Modified text on 2/19/2019 to refer to magistrate judge (ajn). (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/19/2019) (ajn). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/19/2019) (ajn).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7432439) by Lashonda Mitchell. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit ECFS form, #3 Affidavit, #4 Proposed Order)(Lane, Matthew) Modified text on 2/19/2019 to refer to magistrate judge (ajn). (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/19/2019) (ajn). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/19/2019) (ajn).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Lashonda Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Lashonda Mitchell(pty:pla).(Lane, Matthew) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashonda Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew David Lane, Jr.
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?