Leflore et al v. Norfolk Southern Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Leflore and Peola Leflore
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp., Wells Fargo & Company d/b/a Wells Fargo Rail Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co., Norfolk Southern Corporation and Union Tank Car Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01449
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
3 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Norfolk Southern Corporation to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages (Rec. Doc. 1). Answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/8/2019. (cg)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Original Complaint by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Elizabeth Swingle Horn added to party Norfolk Southern Corporation(pty:dft).(Horn, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Wells Fargo & Co. served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019. (Schonekas, Logan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Schonekas, Logan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Union Tank Car Company, Wells Fargo & Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Malcolm Leflore, Peola Leflore. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Schonekas, Logan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Wells Fargo & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Co. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Schonekas, Logan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Schonekas, Logan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Wells Fargo & Co.. (Schonekas, Logan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Schonekas, Logan)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/28/2019.(caa)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Carl Barbier. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corp., Wells Fargo & Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sbs)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request of Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Co. filed by Malcolm Leflore, Peola Leflore re #1 Complaint. (Albertine, Logan) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (sbs).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Norfolk Southern Corp., Wells Fargo & Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7432757) filed by Malcolm Leflore, Peola Leflore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Logan S. Albertine added to party Malcolm Leflore(pty:pla), Attorney Logan S. Albertine added to party Peola Leflore(pty:pla).(Albertine, Logan) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leflore et al v. Norfolk Southern Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company d/b/a Wells Fargo Rail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Swingle Horn
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Slater, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Tank Car Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Leflore
Represented By: Logan S. Albertine
Represented By: Gina Palermo
Represented By: Stephen M. Huber
Represented By: Logan E. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peola Leflore
Represented By: Logan S. Albertine
Represented By: Gina Palermo
Represented By: Stephen M. Huber
Represented By: Logan E. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?