Seale v. Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon

Plaintiff: William B. Seale, Jr.
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Case Number: 2:2019cv01610
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Barry W Ashe. All discovery must be completed by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (kac)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon.(Beckman, Kristin) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (sa).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company for Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon. (Beckman, Kristin) Added Corporate Parent 2/22/2019. (mm) Modified text on 3/11/2019 (sa).
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance by Safeco Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Beckman, Kristin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 19-00028, C-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7440957) filed by Safeco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party) Attorney Kristin L. Beckman added to party Safeco Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Beckman, Kristin) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seale v. Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin L. Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Kristin L. Beckman
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Seale, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Mark Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?