Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. v. Curahealth New Orleans, LLC

Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.
Defendant: Curahealth New Orleans, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01732
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend and #16 Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff shall have until July 10, 2019 to complete jurisdictional discovery and to file an Amended Complaint alleging sufficient facts for this Court to determine the citizenship of Defendant Curahealth New Orleans, LLC. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Status Conference and for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chetta, Chloe)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend and for Status Conference by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Chetta, Chloe)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Curahealth New Orleans, LLC is granted an extension of twenty (20) days until after the date that Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company files its Court-ordered amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/5/19. (ecm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Curahealth New Orleans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Kepner Brown added to party Curahealth New Orleans, LLC(pty:dft).(Brown, Matthew)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Discovery and Extension, and #10 Motion to Expedite. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until May 10, 2019 to complete jurisdictional discovery and to file an Amended Complaint alleging sufficient facts for this Court to determine the citizenship of Defendant Curahealth New Orleans, LLC. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/8/2019. (sa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Expedite, and #9 MOTION for Discovery On Jurisdiction, MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. These motions will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (sa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration, #9 MOTION for Discovery On Jurisdiction, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chetta, Chloe) Modified text/link/referral on 3/7/2019 (sa).
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery On Jurisdiction, MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Chetta, Chloe) Modified text/referral on 3/7/2019 (sa).
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Curahealth New Orleans, LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Chetta, Chloe)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND REASONS: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to adequately allege diversity of citizenship. Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint no later than March 12, 2019 that specifically alleges the member(s) of Defendant and their citizenship. Failure to timely comply with this Courts Order will result in dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/28/2019.(mm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Curahealth New Orleans, LLC. (am)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REALLOTTING CASE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455(a), I hereby recuse myself from acting on this case. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another section of this Court. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/27/2019.(cg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent Allied Workd Assurance Company, LTD, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (Ireland) Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, GmbH, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings (Switzerland) GmbH, Corporate Parent 1102952 B.C. Unlimited Liability Company, Corporate Parent OCM Goldfish Inc., Corporate Parent OMERS Administration Corporation, Corporate Parent Allied World Assurance Holdings (US) Inc, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Allied World Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AW Underwriters, Inc. for Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. (Chetta, Chloe) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (am).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Curahealth New Orleans, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7448196) filed by Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)Attorney Judy Y. Barrasso added to party Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.(pty:pla).(Barrasso, Judy) (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/27/2019) (am). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/27/2019) (am). Modified text on 2/27/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co. v. Curahealth New Orleans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Ins. Co.
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Lorcan L. Connick
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curahealth New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kepner Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?