Murtagh v. Americas Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Angela Murtagh
Defendant: Americas Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01762
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS: Denying #5 Motion to Remand as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 4/3/2019. (ajn)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Angela Murtagh re #5 MOTION to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ajn)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/25/2019. (ajn)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Angela Murtagh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Catalanotto, Rachael) Modified text on 3/25/2019 to correct event (ajn).
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Americas Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Riche, Kevin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela Murtagh (Catalanotto, Rachael)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Petition for Damages by Americas Insurance Company.(Riche, Kevin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance List of All Parties and Pleadings by Americas Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Verification)(Riche, Kevin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and Request for Attorney's Fees by Angela Murtagh. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A - Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit B - Dwelling Policy Declaration, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit D - Petition for Damages, #7 Exhibit E - Email Exchange, #8 Exhibit F - Verification of Time)Attorney Craig Joseph Robichaux added to party Angela Murtagh(pty:pla).(Robichaux, Craig)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(ajn)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Americas Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Assure Holding Corporation for Americas Insurance Company (Riche, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil Distirct Court Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-9918 Div. "F" Sec. 7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7450464) filed by Americas Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)Attorney Kevin P. Riche added to party Americas Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Riche, Kevin) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murtagh v. Americas Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Murtagh
Represented By: Rachael Patton Catalanotto
Represented By: Craig Joseph Robichaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americas Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin P. Riche
Represented By: Blake J. Lusk
Represented By: Matthew D. Monson
Represented By: Laura H. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?