GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Odoms

Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Michael Odoms
Case Number: 2:2019cv01899
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and that MICHAEL ODOMS has an additional thirty-one (31) days, or until May 9, 2019, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/9/2019. (sa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Michael Odoms. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joseph F. LaHatte, III added to party Michael Odoms(pty:dft).(LaHatte, Joseph)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Michael Odoms served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Schexnyder, LaDonna)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Odoms. (sbs)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Odoms (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7456780) filed by GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)Attorney LaDonna Grey Schexnyder added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Schexnyder, LaDonna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company v. Odoms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: LaDonna Grey Schexnyder
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Odoms
Represented By: Joseph F. LaHatte, III
Represented By: Katherine Ann Gurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?