Matherne v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Erica Matherne
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv02671
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED that attorney John Price McNamara is substituted as counsel of record in place of attorney Christina Leigh Carroll for plaintiff, Erica Matherne. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/15/2019. (sa)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney J. Price McNamara to be substituted in place of Christina L. Carroll by Erica Matherne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carroll, Christina)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Bench Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. All discovery must be completed by 12/19/2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: MAG-2)(cbs)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 09:45 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shelley R. Hebert. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (clc)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ian H. Morrison. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (clc)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Shelley R. Hebert (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7550565) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Patricia)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ian H. Morrison (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7550554) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Patricia)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Prudential Insurance Company of America re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LeBlanc, Patricia)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(LeBlanc, Patricia) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (clc).
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. By the Clerk.(jeg)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America (LeBlanc, Patricia) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (jeg).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 29th Judicial District Court St. Charles Parish, case number 85,852 Div E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7493592) filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Patricia Schuster LeBlanc added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).(LeBlanc, Patricia) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matherne v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Patricia Schuster LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Shelley R. Hebert
Represented By: Patricia Schuster LeBlanc
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Matherne
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Represented By: Christina Leigh Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?