Hanover American Insurance Company v. Singley et al
Plaintiff: Hanover American Insurance Company
Defendant: Patrick Singley, Regina Torre, Leonard A Torre, Gautreau's Acquisition Corp, Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC, Leonard Torre and Gautreau's Acquisition Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02730
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gautreau's Acquisition Corp., Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC, Patrick Singley. Attorney Joseph M. Bruno added to party Gautreau's Acquisition Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph M. Bruno added to party Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph M. Bruno added to party Patrick Singley(pty:dft).(Bruno, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION to Continue Submission Deadline for Abstention. FURTHER ORDERED that the submission date for #6 MOTION for Abstention, Dismissal or Alternatively, Stay of the Declaratory Action, originally set for June 19, 2019, be and hereby is reset to July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/12/2019.(jeg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #6 MOTION for Abstention, Dismissal or Alternatively, Stay of the Declaratory Action filed by Regina Torre, Leonard Torre. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter.(mmv)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION to Continue Submission Deadline for Abstention. **Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Hanover American Insurance Company regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION to Stay of this Declaratory Action (Kappen, Tina)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Hanover American Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION to Stay of this Declaratory Action . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kappen, Tina)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Deadline for Abstention by Hanover American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kappen, Tina) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (jeg).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(cg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Abstention, Dismissal or Alternatively, Stay of the Declaratory Action. **1. Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Janis van Meerveld(1). 2. Attachment 3 was filed sideways. Clerk has corrected image. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (mm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Abstention, Dismissal or Alternatively, Stay of the Declaratory Action by Leonard Torre, Regina Torre. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission) Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party Leonard Torre(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party Regina Torre(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/22/2019) (mm). Modified text on 5/22/2019 (mm).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gautreau's Acquisition Corp., Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC, Patrick Singley, Leonard Torre, Regina Torre. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(cg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Gautreau's Acquisition Corp., Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC, Patrick Singley, Leonard Torre, Regina Torre filed by Hanover American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gautreau's, #2 Summons Ivy Restaurant, #3 Summons Leonard Torre, #4 Summons Regina Torre)(Kappen, Tina)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: Request of Summons Issued as to Gautreau's Acquisition Corp., Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC, Patrick Singley, Leonard Torre, Regina Torre filed by Hanover American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gautreau's, #2 Summons Ivy Restaurant, #3 Summons Leonard Torre, #4 Summons Regina Torre)(Kappen, Tina) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cg).
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hanover American Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7496733) filed by Hanover American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Law Suit Patrick Singley, #8 Notice of Law Suit Gautreau's Acquisition, #9 Notice of Law Suit Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, #10 Notice of Law Suit Leonard Torre, #11 Notice of Law Suit Regina Torre)Attorney Tina L. Kappen added to party Hanover American Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Kappen, Tina) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover American Insurance Company v. Singley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Singley
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Donald David Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Torre
Represented By: Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard A Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gautreau's Acquisition Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Restaurant New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Donald David Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Torre
Represented By: Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gautreau's Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Donald David Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover American Insurance Company
Represented By: Tina L. Kappen
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?