Collins et al v. Rand et al

Plaintiff: David Brown and Kolby Collins
Defendant: Rhyan Rand, Germania Fire Insurance, Germania Fire and Casualty Company and Germania Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv02772
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Considering the plaintiff's #11 response to the Court's show cause order, IT IS ORDERED that the matter is hereby passed 60 days to allow the waiver of service and responsive pleading to be filed. Otherwise, defendant Rhyan Rand will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/26/2019.(mm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER. **1. Document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1 states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed. 2. Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Dana Douglas(3).** (mm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER by All Plaintiffs re #10 Order (Weinstock, Jake) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/26/2019) (mm).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER plaintiffs show good cause in writing within 20 days why Rhyan Rand should not be dismissed for failure to serve in accordance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/6/19.(jjs)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney H. James Parker for Germania Fire and Casualty Company. Attorney Natasha Z. Wilson terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/29/2019. (mm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Withdraw Natasha Z. Wilson as Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney. **Not necessary to select relief Motion to Withdraw for this document. Only the relief Motion to Substitute is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record H. James Parker by Germania Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hailey, James) Modified text/removed additional event on 5/28/2019 (mm).
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint. **Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Germania Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Germania Farm Mutual Insurance Association for Germania Fire and Casualty Company (Hailey, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Germania Fire and Casualty Company.(Hailey, James) Modified text/added linkage on 4/1/2019 (mm).
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance by Germania Fire Insurance re #1 Notice of Removal. (am)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-01377, G-11 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7498290) filed by Germania Fire Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Filing State Court Record, #4 Exhibit List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action)Attorney James W. Hailey, III added to party Germania Fire Insurance(pty:dft).(Hailey, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/22/2019) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2019) (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/22/2019) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/22/2019) (am). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/22/2019) (am). Modified text on 3/25/2019 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. Rand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhyan Rand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germania Fire Insurance
Represented By: Natasha Z. Wilson
Represented By: Meredith Anne Mayberry
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Represented By: Shannon C. Burr
Represented By: James Vance King, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germania Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Natasha Z. Wilson
Represented By: Meredith Anne Mayberry
Represented By: James W. Hailey, III
Represented By: Shannon C. Burr
Represented By: James Vance King, III
Represented By: Hearl James Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Germania Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Represented By: Jake Joseph Weinstock
Represented By: Irvy Ernest Cosse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolby Collins
Represented By: Jake Joseph Weinstock
Represented By: Irvy Ernest Cosse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?