Lee et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: James Lee and Jahmad Lee
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Kevin Meszaros and Stephen Meszaros
Case Number: 2:2019cv09131
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/28/2019.(blg)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference, which was scheduled for Wednesday, 6/5/2019 at 2:00 p.m. SHALL BE RESCHEDULED for Wednesday, 6/5/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Parties to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/28/2019.(sbs)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - A status conference is scheduled in this case on Wednesday, 6/5/2019 at 2:00 P.M. Parties to comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/23/19.(sbs)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/5/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 8/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(sbs)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John J. Elmer for Jahmad Lee and James Lee. FURTHER ORDERED that John J. Elmer, Jr. shall be designated lead trial attorney. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/16/19. (sbs)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Portion of Exhibit A was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Kevin Meszaros, Stephen Meszaros, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zsembik, Michael) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/12/2019) (sbs).
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record John Elmer by Jahmad Lee, James Lee. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Lassalle, Joseph) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (sbs).
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Kevin Meszaros, Stephen Meszaros, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Zsembik, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kevin Meszaros, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Stephen Meszaros. By the Clerk.(sbs)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (djg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-01598 J-15 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7553390) filed by Stephen Meszaros, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Kevin Meszaros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)Attorney Michael Robert Zsembik added to party Kevin Meszaros(pty:dft), Stephen Meszaros(pty:dft), Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Zsembik, Michael) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee
Represented By: Joseph G. Lassalle
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jahmad Lee
Represented By: Joseph G. Lassalle
Represented By: Edward J. Womac, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Robert Zsembik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Meszaros
Represented By: Michael Robert Zsembik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Meszaros
Represented By: Michael Robert Zsembik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?