Ackerson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Alric Desmond Ackerson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv09158
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7 (sa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration through US Attorney, served on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (sa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clc)(CC: pla w/ copy of Pauper order & Pauper Letter)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/10/19. (clc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (clc).
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alric Desmond Ackerson. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (sa)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Alric Desmond Ackerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alric Desmond Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?