2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC
Defendant: LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC and Kia Martin
Case Number: 2:2019cv09182
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC (Congeni, Leo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Western Bank, Corporate Parent PacWest Bancorp for 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC (Menasco, Carey)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:20 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin.Attorney Leo David Congeni added to party LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC(pty:dft).(Congeni, Leo)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Kia Martin on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Menasco, Carey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC, Kia Martin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7557613) filed by 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note & Allonge, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage and UCC filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Merger Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Loan Modification and Forbearance Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demand Letters, #6 Exhibit 6 - Quitclaim Deed, #7 Exhibit 7 - Assignment, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Carey L. Menasco added to party 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC(pty:pla).(Menasco, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPlace Veterinary Clinic, LLC
Represented By: Leo David Congeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2921 New Highway 51 SBL LLC
Represented By: Carey L. Menasco
Represented By: Melanie Nicole Derefinko
Represented By: Philip Kirkpatrick Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Dena Lynn Olivier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?