David v. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Glinda David
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Cleother Crain, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09323
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AMENDING #8 Order of Partial Dismissal - Considering counsel's letter notifying the Court that plaintiff and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company settled all disputes and differences and requesting a dismiss of all claims against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, only, with prejudice, IT IS ORDERED that the partial dismissal order entered on May 30, 2019 is hereby amended to reflect the claims against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, only, are dismissed with prejudice. All other aspects of the partial dismissal order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/17/2019.(cg)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (2 to 3 days) set for 4/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 3/10/2020.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised by counsel for plaintiff and State Farm that they have firmly agreed upon a compromise of the claims between them; IT IS ORDERED that this action be and it is hereby dismissed as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company only, without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, within sixty days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. In addition, the Court specifically retains jurisdiction to enforce thesettlement agreement if settlement is not consummated in sixty days. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2); Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511 U.S. 375, 381-82 (1994); Hospitality House, Inc. v. Gilbert, 298 F.3d 424, 430 (5th Cir. 2002). Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal Letter)(mm)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/16/19.(jjs)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Cleother Crain, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Compliance by Cleother Crain, Mountain Laurel Assurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Pleadings, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 State Court Pleadings, #8 State Court Pleadings, #9 State Court Pleadings, #10 State Court Pleadings, #11 State Court Pleadings, #12 State Court Pleadings, #13 State Court Pleadings, #14 State Court Pleadings, #15 State Court Pleadings, #16 State Court Pleadings, #17 State Court Pleadings, #18 State Court Pleadings, #19 State Court Pleadings)(Giordano, Charles) Modified event on 4/15/2019 (mm).
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company identifying Corporate Parents Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. and Progressive Corporation for Mountain Laurel Assurance Company. (Giordano, Charles)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 29th JDC, St. Charles Parish, case number 85031 E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7567606) filed by Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, Cleother Crain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Verification, #5 List of Parties)Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party Cleother Crain(pty:dbpos), Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party Mountain Laurel Assurance Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. Mountain Laurel Assurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glinda David
Represented By: Ross M. LeBlanc
Represented By: John Salm Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Laurel Assurance Company
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jennifer Cooper Thomas
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleother Crain
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jennifer Cooper Thomas
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason LaBorde Rush
Represented By: Kerth J. Gravener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?