Otto v. Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.
Plaintiff: Renee Otto
Defendant: Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09343
Filed: April 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that the action be and it is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if the settlement is not consummated within a reasonable time. The Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/17/2019.(sa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Renee Otto . (Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (sa).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/10/2019. (clc)(cc: DEF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Berlin - Wheeler, Inc. by Renee Otto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Berlin - Wheeler, Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Green Card)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Berlin - Wheeler, Inc. (sa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
April 16, 2019 Filing fee paid by Renee Otto re #1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7575954) (Imbraguglio, Niko) Modified text/filers on 4/16/2019 (sa).
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (cc)
April 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berlin - Wheeler, Inc. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Niko Angelo Imbraguglio added to party Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.(pty:dft).(Imbraguglio, Niko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otto v. Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Otto
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin - Wheeler, Inc.
Represented By: Niko Angelo Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?