Roque v. Cross
Plaintiff: Justo E. Roque, Jr.
Defendant: Douglas Cross
Case Number: 2:2019cv09385
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Justo E. Roque, Jr as to #10 Judgment. (mmv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Justo E. Roque, Jr as to #10 Judgment. (mmv)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Complaint filed by Justo E. Roque, Jr. against Defendant, Douglas Cross, D.D.S., is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/12/2019.(jls)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS ORDERED that the Complaint filed by Justo E. Roque, Jr. against Defendant, Douglas Cross, D.D.S., is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/12/2019.(jls)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 5/15/2019.(cg)(NEF Judge Brown)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Justo E. Roque, Jr re #3 Order to Show Cause. (mmv)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the issue of jurisdictional briefing is referred to the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case for resolution. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/14/2019.(mmv) (NEF: MJ Douglas, Case Mgr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Response by Justo E. Roque, Jr to #4 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mmv) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jjs).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff submit briefing regarding the citizenship of Defendant Douglas Cross to the Court by May 25, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff submit summary-judgment-type evidence regarding the amount in controversy at the time that the Complaint was filed, April 15, 2019, to the Court by May 25, 2019.Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/22/2019.(my)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and GRANTING Motion to proceed in forma pauperis as to Pro se plaintiff Justo E. Roque, Jr. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold summons until the Court finds that plaintiff has satisfied the following rule to show cause. For the reasons detailed stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that on or before Wednesday, May 15, 2019, plaintiff Justo E. Roque, Jr. shall file a response containing a written statement of his position concerning this Court's Rule to Show Cause Order and a list of citations of authorities on which plaintiff relies to establish subject-matter jurisdiction over his complaint. The failure to respond in writing as directed will result in the dismissal of the captioned complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be NO ORAL HEARING, and the matter will be deemed under advisement on the briefs on Wednesday, May 15, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 4/16/2019.(cg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justo E. Roque, Jr. Motion(s) referred to Dana Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mmv)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas Cross filed by Justo E. Roque, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(mmv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roque v. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justo E. Roque, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?