Prince v. Primerica Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Matthew Joseph Prince
Defendant: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09444
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Bench Trial set for 1/22/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Primerica Life Insurance Company for Primerica Life Insurance Company (McCormack, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 02:20 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to Rec. Doc. 1. (mp)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Primerica Life Insurance Company.(McCormack, Richard) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (mp).
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(ajn)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC-Terrebonne - Prince v. Primerica, case number 185285 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7578398) filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)Attorney Richard Edward McCormack added to party Primerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(McCormack, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Primerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Joseph Prince
Represented By: Dennis John Elfert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Edward McCormack
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gretchen F. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?