Hughes v. Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Aaron Hughes
Defendant: Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09532
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(blg)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David I. Moulton. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/24/19. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David I. Moulton. **Documents contain incorrect spelling of Magistrate Judge's lastname in caption. Correct spelling is Douglas.** (sbs)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David I. Moulton (Filing fee $100 receipt number 053L-7593703) by Aaron Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew) Modified text on 4/23/2019 (sbs).
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C. (sbs)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C. filed by Aaron Hughes re #1 Complaint. (Parmet, Matthew)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 OBJECTIONS by Aaron Hughes Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8 (Parmet, Matthew)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7582500) filed by Aaron Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Matthew Scott Parmet added to party Aaron Hughes(pty:pla).(Parmet, Matthew) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hughes
Represented By: David I. Moulton
Represented By: Matthew Scott Parmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Lafitte Harbor, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?