Crescent City Surgical Centre v. Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crescent City Surgical Centre
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc. and Humana Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv09540
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Carl Barbier. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Carl Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 4/14/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(cg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in Support to Response to Motion filed by Crescent City Surgical Centre re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (cg)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/7/2019. (cg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Crescent City Surgical Centre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Flanagan, Thomas)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Response/Reply. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Co re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(King, Errol) Modified event/text/linkage on 5/2/2019 (mm).
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Co re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Rush, Layna)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 4) set for May 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. The Motion will be considered on the briefs unless the Court instructs the parties otherwise. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/29/2019.(cg)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John Emory Sudderth for Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc.,Humana Health Plan, Inc. and Humana Insurance Co. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/25/2019. (cg)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Health Plan, Inc., Humana Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Errol) Modified on 4/25/2019 (cg).
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Clerk re #5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Pursuant to Local Rule 78.1, this motion is set for hearing with oral argument on 5/8/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Carl J. Barbier. (cg)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Crescent City Surgical Centre regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Flanagan, Thomas)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Crescent City Surgical Centre. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan added to party Crescent City Surgical Centre(pty:pla).(Flanagan, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk(cg)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 788-321 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7584369) filed by Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc., Humana Insurance Company, Humana Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Attorney Errol J. King added to party Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Errol J. King added to party Humana Health Plan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Errol J. King added to party Humana Insurance Company(pty:dft).(King, Errol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crescent City Surgical Centre v. Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: John Emory Sudderth
Represented By: Craig Lewis Caesar
Represented By: Errol J. King
Represented By: Layna Cook Rush
Represented By: Daniel P. Guillory
Represented By: Katherine C. Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Benefit Plan of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: John Emory Sudderth
Represented By: Craig Lewis Caesar
Represented By: Errol J. King
Represented By: Layna Cook Rush
Represented By: Daniel P. Guillory
Represented By: Katherine C. Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Insurance Co
Represented By: John Emory Sudderth
Represented By: Craig Lewis Caesar
Represented By: Errol J. King
Represented By: Layna Cook Rush
Represented By: Daniel P. Guillory
Represented By: Katherine C. Mannino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crescent City Surgical Centre
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Gilbert V. Andry, IV
Represented By: Andy Joseph Dupre
Represented By: Thomas J. Capella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?