Soliz et al v. Emerson Electric Co., et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Soliz and Alfred Soliz
Defendant: ITT LLC, Marathon Oil Company, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, Texaco Inc, Shell Oil Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., El Paso Energy, E.S.T., Emerson Electric Co, Exxon Mobil Corporation and ConocoPhillips Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv09928
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: ORDERED that the above captioned cause is hereby CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 17-8977, Lopez v. McDermott, Inc., et al., of this Court pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 42(a). Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/10/2019.(jeg)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents two defendants in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/8/2019.(mmv) (NEF: J. Fallon, MJ North, Case Mgr)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on May 6, 2019.(mp)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/3/2019. (NEF: MAG-4)(caa)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/2/2019.(ajn)
May 2, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00139. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (sa)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 4/23/2019. GRANTED joint oral motion of venue transfer under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)to the Eastern District of Louisiana. GRANTED Plaintiff's oral motion to suspend the deadline for responding to the pending motions in this matter. Once the matter is returned to the Eastern District of Louisiana, counsel for Plaintiff shall contact the appropriate Judge to set a status conference to address discovery and set deadlines. (EDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Concerning Texas Paternity Action by All Plaintiffs. (Blackwell, Brian) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by El Paso Energy E.S.T., Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rossi, Alexandra) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2019. Court summarized procedural history. Counsel for Plaintiff informed Court of status. On or before 4/21/2019, briefs shall be filed. Telephone conference set for 4/23/2019 at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for defendants responsible for coordinating call to the Court. (SGO) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add document(SGO). [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Opposing Pending Motions to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Blackwell, Brian) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference is reset for 4/10/2019 at 11:15 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles. Counsel for Defendants is responsible for coordinating the call to the Court (225-389-3568). Counsel shall call the Court from a land-line, if possible, in order to eliminate any extraneous noise. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge John W. deGravelles.Counsel for Defendants is responsible for coordinating the call to the Court (225-389-3568). Counsel shall call the Court from a land-line, if possible, in order to eliminate any extraneous noise. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Shofstahl, Tyson) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/18/19. (Charles, Cherie) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Texaco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit)(Viator, John) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Shofstahl, Tyson) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(f), the undersigned Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Middle District of Louisiana and the Eastern District of Louisiana hereby concur in and authorize the temporary assignment of United States Magistrate Judge Michael B. North of the Eastern District to perform the duties designated herein in the Middle District in connection with the captioned case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Chief Judge Nanette Jolivette Brown on 03/13/2019. (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Unassigned. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Exxon Mobil Corporation's Notice of Removal by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal)(Viator, John) [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 675954. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1909647), filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Viator, John) Modified on 3/11/2019 to flatten attachment (KAH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/20/2019) (ELW). Modified on 3/20/2019 as granted by rec doc 7 (ELW). [Transferred from lamd on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soliz et al v. Emerson Electric Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Peter Sinnott Martin
Represented By: Keith Wade McDaniel
Represented By: Keith W. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Gray
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Gray
Represented By: Michelle Miller Roy
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Energy, E.S.T.
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Karli Glascock Johnson
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson Electric Co
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: Melissa Jade Shaffer
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Tyson B. Shofstahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Soliz
Represented By: Brian Francis Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Soliz
Represented By: Brian Francis Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?