Dressner v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Dressner
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2019cv09974
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(ajn)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/1/19.(sbs)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Dustin Dressner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel added to party Dustin Dressner(pty:pla).(Trenticosta Kappel, Cecelia) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dressner v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Dressner
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Represented By: Blythe H.L. Taplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?