Bowie et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: George Bowie, Rosie Bowie and Trina Bowie
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, K&B Louisiana Corporation and Schwegmann Westside Expressway, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv09981
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Receipt of Case Transferred to District of New Jersey (am)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2738. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 5/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(clc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2738. (clc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice (Other). Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section F and Magistrate 4.** (clc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027. (Scalia, David)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/1/19.(sbs)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (sbs).
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
May 1, 2019 Filing fee received from Sossamon, Meera Unnithan: receipt 053L-7612628 $400.00 (cc) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (sbs).
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2018-295 A-15 (Fee previously paid) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - Part 3, #5 Exhibit B - Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowie et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: James B. Irwin, V
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Lambert Joseph Hassinger, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine W Trotter
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwegmann Westside Expressway, Inc.
Represented By: Jean-Paul Layrisson
Represented By: Krista M. Eleew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bowie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: David Scott Scalia
Represented By: Mekel R. Smith
Represented By: Bonnie Adele Kendrick
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Bowie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: David Scott Scalia
Represented By: Mekel R. Smith
Represented By: Bonnie Adele Kendrick
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Bowie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: David Scott Scalia
Represented By: Mekel R. Smith
Represented By: Bonnie Adele Kendrick
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?