Jackson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Jackson and Cathy M. Jackson
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Imerys Talc America, Inc., K&B Louisiana Corporation and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv09983
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1452a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating Conditional Transfer Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-143" filed on 5/8/2019, is VACATED insofar as it relates to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Hearing Session Order and the attached Schedule filed on 6/18/2019, are VACATED insofar as they relate to this action. Signed by Clerk of the Panel.(my)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's #6 motion to remand is GRANTED, as set forth in document. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (am)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(clc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Leave to File Opposition in Excess of Pages. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/12/2019. (clc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cathy M. Jackson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1447(b) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc re #4 Directive. Attorney Carlos Andre Benach added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft).(Benach, Carlos)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Directive pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk. (clc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Noonan, Claire) Modified on 5/2/2019 (clc).
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-2673 L(6) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7612819) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies. Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (clc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mindy Brickman
Represented By: Oscar M. Gwin, IV
Represented By: Christy L. McMannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Claire Adams Noonan
Represented By: Carlos Andre Benach
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy M. Jackson
Represented By: Jason F. Giles
Represented By: Rubiante Lolana Brown
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Wesley J. Gralapp
Represented By: Richard J. Arsenault
Represented By: Brian King
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?