Taylor et al v. U.S. Department of Health & Human Services

Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor and Katelyn Wallgren
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Intervenor: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv10023
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Department of Health & Human Services served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wagar, Nelson)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(cg)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Intervene.. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/4/2019. (cg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Intervene by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert A. Kutcher added to party Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP(pty:intv).(Kutcher, Robert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jeg)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wagar, Nelson) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/3/2019) (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/3/2019) (jeg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/3/2019) (jeg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health & Human Services (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7614591) filed by Daniel Taylor, Katelyn Wallgren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nelson W. Wagar, III added to party Daniel Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Nelson W. Wagar, III added to party Katelyn Wallgren(pty:pla).(Wagar, Nelson) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/3/2019) (cg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Represented By: Justin E. Alsterberg
Represented By: Sarah W. Hickman
Represented By: Julie U. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Wallgren
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Represented By: Justin E. Alsterberg
Represented By: Sarah W. Hickman
Represented By: Julie U. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?