In Re: Howell
Appellee: Seale & Ross, A Professional Law Corporation, Gordon Arata McCollam Duplantis and Eagan LLC, Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV, Leslie Bolner, Glen Galbraith, David J. Messina, Lake Villas No. 2 Homeowners Association, Inc., Donald H Grodsky, David Adler and Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Elise LaMartina, John T LaMartina Howell and John T. LaMartina Howell
Case Number: 2:2019cv10068
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Response to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition. Clerk took corrective action. (mp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Gordon Arata McCollam Duplantis and Eagan LLC, Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, #16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis . (Hayne, C.) Modified text/event on 7/1/2019 (mp).
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Elise LaMartina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(sbs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by John T. LaMartina Howell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(sbs)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 19-30494 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by John T. LaMartina Howell, Elise LaMartina. (blg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL by John T. LaMartina Howell, Elise LaMartina as to #12 Judgment. (sbs)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: ORDERED that that the decision of the United States Bankruptcy Court is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/31/2019.(blg) (CC:USBC-Ct & Judge, US Trustee)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND REASONS re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by John T. LaMartina Howell, Elise LaMartina; ORDERED that the bankruptcy court's opinion is ADOPTED as this Court's own opinion, and its decision dismissing the complaint and issuing the permanent injunction is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/31/2019.(blg) (CC:USBC-Ct & Judge, US Trustee)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Appellee's BRIEF by Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC. (sbs)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Separate Brief. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/28/2019. (sbs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Appellee's Brief. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future filings must reflect Section I and Magistrate Judge 4.** (sbs)
May 27, 2019 Filing 7 Appellee's BRIEF by Leslie Bolner, Glen Galbraith, Lake Villas No. 2 Homeowners Association, Inc., Seale & Ross, A Professional Law Corporation. (Galbraith, Glen)
May 27, 2019 Filing 6 Appellee's BRIEF by David Adler, Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV, David J. Messina. (Messina, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Separate Appeal Brief by Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayne, C.) Modified text and filer on 5/28/2019 (sbs).
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by John T. LaMartina Howell, Elise LaMartina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2)(sbs)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by David Adler, John T. LaMartina Howell, Elise LaMartina re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Complete Record on Appeal by USBC. (Attachments: #1 Appellant - USBC AVD Case 18-1006, #2 Appellant - USBC BK Case 09-13383, #3 Appellee Designations, #4 Appellee - USBC ADV Case 18-1006, #5 Appellee - USBC BK Case 09-13383) (*filed in case 18-6325, doc. no. 5)(blg)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the designation of the record in civil action number 18-6325 into the record for this matter. FURTHER ORDERED that the appellants shall file their briefs in accordance with this order no later than 5/20/2019. FURTHER ORDERED that the appellees shall file their briefs in accordance with this order no later than 5/27/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/8/2019.(blg)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Judge Brown. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Designation(s) of Record received; filed by Elise LaMartina, John T LaMartina Howell. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Written Reasons for Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seale & Ross, A Professional Law Corporation
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gordon Arata McCollam Duplantis and Eagan LLC
Represented By: C. Peck Hayne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV
Represented By: David John Messina
Represented By: Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV
Represented By: C. Peck Hayne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leslie Bolner
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Glen Galbraith
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David J. Messina
Represented By: David John Messina
Represented By: Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV
Represented By: C. Peck Hayne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lake Villas No. 2 Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Donald H Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Adler
Represented By: David John Messina
Represented By: Fernand L. Laudumiey, IV
Represented By: C. Peck Hayne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gordon, Arata, Montgomery, Barnett, McCollam, Duplantis & Eagan, LLC
Represented By: C. Peck Hayne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elise LaMartina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John T LaMartina Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John T. LaMartina Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?