Chiu et al v. Lincoln et al
Plaintiff: Yu-Wen Chiu and Chih-Yang Hu
Defendant: Charles Edward Lincoln, III and Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV
Petitioner: Donna Cerigny
Case Number: 2:2019cv10080
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Susie Morgan
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Remand and for Sanctions; GRANTING #8 Motion to Remand. This matter is REMANDED back to the First City Court for the City of New Orleans, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 05/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (am)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Recuse Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle by Donna Cerigny. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(am)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Emergency Status Conference.**Document marked as Filed in Error, please see rec. doc. 10 for corrected filing.** (am)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Emergency Status Conference by Yu-Wen Chiu, Chih-Yang Hu (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chenevert, Matthew) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (am).
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR - SEE REC. DOC. 10** MOTION for Emergency Status Conference by Yu-Wen Chiu, Chih-Yang Hu for Emergency Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chenevert, Matthew) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (am).
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Voluntary Remand by Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(jls)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV re #4 MOTION to Remand and for Sanctions. (jls)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Donna Cerigny. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(am)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Remand and For Sanctions.**1. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **2.Motion should be filed using only one relief as Motion is titled. **3. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 06/05/2019. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.**4. Motion to Expedite should be filed as a separate docket entry, filed as an 'EXPARTE/CONSENT' along with a proposed order.** (am)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Remand and For Sanctions, by Yu-Wen Chiu, Chih-Yang Hu. Motion(s) will be submitted on 06/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(Chenevert, Matthew) Modified text/submission date on 5/17/2019 (am).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Judge Susie Morgan, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/10/19.(sbs)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV. By the Clerk.(sbs)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First City Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2017-8413 "D" (Filing fee $400) filed by Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiu et al v. Lincoln et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Edward Lincoln, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Edward Andrew Lincoln, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu-Wen Chiu
Represented By: Matthew P. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chih-Yang Hu
Represented By: Matthew P. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donna Cerigny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?