Trahan v. Swartz et al

Plaintiff: Chad Paul Trahan
Defendant: Lt. Swartz, Tommy Rodgers, Gordy Dove, Jerry J Larpenter, Richard Neal and Julius Martin
Case Number: 2:2019cv10145
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: In order for this Court to conduct the screening mandated by federal law, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before 7/3/2019, the Medical Administrator of the Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex produce certified copies of the jail medical records for Chad Paul Trahan, DOC # 387095. The records should be sent to the address as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that copies of the records also be provided to plaintiff for his use in this proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/5/2019. (cc: TPCJC Medical Administrator)(ajn)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $1.73 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Chad Paul Trahan in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/5/2019. (cc: Sheriff)(ajn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chad Paul Trahan. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (cures deficiency) (ajn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 5/30/2019. (ajn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chad Paul Trahan. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (ajn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chad Paul Trahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trahan v. Swartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordy Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry J Larpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Paul Trahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?