Hanberry v. First Premier Bank

Plaintiff: Angel M Hanberry
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv10235
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by First Premier Bank identifying Corporate Parent United National Corporation (Elmer, Vicki) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (clw).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that FPB's #7 Motion is granted and that FPB is given an extension of time of 21 days, through and including July 15, 2019, within which to file responsive pleadings in response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff, Angel M. Hanberry. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/19/2019. (mm)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Vicki A. Elmer added to party First Premier Bank(pty:dft).(Elmer, Vicki)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; First Premier Bank served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (sbs)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7(mp)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to First Premier Bank. (Sent to Plaintiff via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order & Complaint) (mp)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (mp)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel M Hanberry. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (mmv)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Premier Bank filed by Angel M Hanberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(mmv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanberry v. First Premier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Represented By: Vicki A. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel M Hanberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?