Kirby v. Active Treatment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Kirby
Defendant: Active Treatment, Inc., Smiles, Inc. and Marley Marten
Case Number: 2:2019cv10251
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Active Treatment, Inc., Marley Marten, Smiles, Inc..(Galbraith, Glen)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Active Treatment, Inc.; Smiles, Inc.; and Marley Marten, are granted an additional twenty-one (21) days from which pleadings would otherwise be due to file pleadings responsive to the complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/14/2019. (cg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Active Treatment, Inc., Marley Marten, Smiles, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Glen Ray Galbraith added to party Active Treatment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Glen Ray Galbraith added to party Marley Marten(pty:dft), Attorney Glen Ray Galbraith added to party Smiles, Inc.(pty:dft).(Galbraith, Glen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Active Treatment, Inc., Marley Marten, Smiles, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7632394) filed by Melanie Kirby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Request for Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)Attorney Mary Bubbett Jackson added to party Melanie Kirby(pty:pla).(Jackson, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Active Treatment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Treatment, Inc.
Represented By: T. Jay Seale, III
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiles, Inc.
Represented By: T. Jay Seale, III
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marley Marten
Represented By: T. Jay Seale, III
Represented By: Glen Ray Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Kirby
Represented By: Jody Forester Jackson
Represented By: Mary Bubbett Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?