Maddox v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bobbie Marie Maddox
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv10294
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Summons, Pauper Order & Pauper Letter mailed to counsel) (ajn)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Chermol. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/15/2019. (ajn)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/15/2019. (ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Pauper Letter) (ajn).
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk took corrective action by either re-docketing the event or changing the event.** (clc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Procced in forma pauperis by Bobbie Marie Maddox. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application To Proceed IFP, #2 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified on 5/15/2019 (clc).
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 **FILED IN DUPLICATE- See Rec. Doc. #3** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David F. Chermol (Fee previously paid) by Bobbie Marie Maddox. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified on 5/15/2019 (clc).
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of one of the summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdfformat. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David F. Chermol (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7634199) by Bobbie Marie Maddox. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bourgeois, Loyd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/10/2019) (clc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #3 Affidavit) (clc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobbie Marie Maddox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, Loyd) Modified on 5/10/2019 (clc).
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Bobbie Marie Maddox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons United States Attorney General, #4 Summons United States Attorney Office)Attorney Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr added to party Bobbie Marie Maddox(pty:pla).(Bourgeois, Loyd) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/10/2019) (clc). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/15/2019) (ajn). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/15/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Marie Maddox
Represented By: Loyd J. Bourgeois, Jr.
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?