Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company
Defendant: Ernst & Young, LLP, Ashton J. Ryan, William J. Burnell, Gregory St. Angelo, Mark Bell, Mary Beth Verdigets, Unidentified Parties, Ashton J Ryan, Jr and Ernst and Young LLP
Case Number: 2:2019cv10341
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #16 MOTION to Stay by Defendant St. Angelo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Bell, Eric)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Defendant William Burnell by William J. Burnell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brian J. Capitelli added to party William J. Burnell(pty:dft).(Capitelli, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Mark Bell, Ernst and Young LLP re #16 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Isenberg, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Courtney E. Quiros on behalf of defendant Mary Beth Verdigets (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7744235) by Mary Beth Verdigets. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Form)(Stern, Charles)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Gingold Clark on behalf of defendant Mary Beth Verdigets (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7744208) by Mary Beth Verdigets. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Form)(Stern, Charles)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Catherine Gill on behalf od Defendant Mary Beth Verdigets (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7744180) by Mary Beth Verdigets. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Attorney Registration Form)Attorney Charles Louis Stern, Jr added to party Mary Beth Verdigets(pty:dft).(Stern, Charles)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mary Beth Verdigets re #16 MOTION to Stay . (Stern, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay by Gregory St. Angelo. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Bill of Information, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Phillip A. Wittmann added to party Gregory St. Angelo(pty:dft).(Wittmann, Phillip)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(mm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Ashton J Ryan, Jr on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 27, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Ernst and Young LLP on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (O'Bell, Eric) Modified text/answer due date/date waiver sent on 5/28/2019 (mm).
May 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Mark Bell on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (O'Bell, Eric) Modified text/answer due date/date waiver sent on 5/28/2019 (mm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Gregory St. Angelo on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Mary Beth Verdigets on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; William J. Burnell served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mark Bell, William J. Burnell, Ernst and Young LLP, Ashton J Ryan, Jr, Gregory St. Angelo, Mary Beth Verdigets. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(clc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Gregory St. Angelo filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company re #1 Complaint,. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to William J. Burnell filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company re #1 Complaint,. (O'Bell, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Ashton J Ryan, Jr filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (O'Bell, Eric) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/15/2019) (clc).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdfformat. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (clc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7637501) filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Eric J. O'Bell added to party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company(pty:pla).(O'Bell, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2019) (clc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Burnell
Represented By: Brian J. Capitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory St. Angelo
Represented By: C. Lawrence Orlansky
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Represented By: Walter Frederick Metzinger, III
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Verdigets
Represented By: Charles Louis Stern, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton J Ryan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst and Young LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of First NBC Bank Holding Company
Represented By: Eric J. O'Bell
Represented By: Leo David Congeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?