Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc. v. Crosby Dredging, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.
Defendant: Crosby Dredging, LLC, Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland, Crosby Tugs, LLC and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Not Yet Classified: United States America for the use and benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10352
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Answer is due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/8/2019. (ajn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Emily) Modified text/event on 7/3/2019 (clw).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. Answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 14, 2019. (mp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Emily E. Ross added to party Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland(pty:dft).(Ross, Emily)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (ajn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Magee, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7639635) filed by United States America for the use and benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Todd M. Magee added to party United States America for the use and benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Magee, Todd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/14/2019) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc. v. Crosby Dredging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States America for the use and benefit of Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Dredging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Co. of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Tugs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Emily E. Ross
Represented By: David Joseph Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frogco Amphibious Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Magee
Represented By: William Nicholas Abel
Represented By: Christopher H. Riviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?